Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Migliaccio, Anthony J, against Richard Straub Aka Richard J Straub I, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts with Christopher P Baker presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 11, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 05, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 07, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: October 12, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 05, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 29, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 29, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 06, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 18, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1) Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 18, 2023BILL OF COSTS
Date: July 18, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1) Last Payment Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1) Balance Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1) S&C Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 18, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 18, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 18, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 18, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 14, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: August 14, 2023ORDER - FINAL
Date: August 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2023 | Notice of Entry of Judgment entered 10/12/23 | ||
October 12, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 11, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Order |
||
September 05, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 05, 2023 | Notice of Entry of an Order entered on 8/22/23 | ||
August 22, 2023 | ORDER - FINAL | ||
August 14, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 14, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) | ||
July 18, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Additional Notice of Consumer Credit Action With Copy of Affidavit of Service of S&C |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.