Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Margaret Mary Cuomo, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Flynn, Kevin Patrick, against Michael M. Cuomo, represented by Daubner, Susan Moore, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts with Christopher P Baker presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2023 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2024 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER | ||
December 20, 2023 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
December 05, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
November 22, 2023 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
November 21, 2023 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | ||
November 07, 2023 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
November 07, 2023 | PART 130 CERTIFICATION | ||
November 07, 2023 | AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY | ||
November 07, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT | ||
November 07, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.