Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Credit Acceptance Corporation, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Jesse Newell, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
JUDGMENT
Date: October 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 16, 2023ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: January 18, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: October 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 09, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 20, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 16, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 16, 2023 | Affidavit of Facts and Sale of Acct by Orig Cred | ||
October 16, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
January 18, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
January 09, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 20, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 20, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.