Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Empower Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Shaw, Amanda C, against Jane Doe, John Doe, Tammy M Sparling A K A Tammy M. Miller, Terrence J Miller, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts with Christopher P Baker presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 10, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 10, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: August 10, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: August 10, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 25, 2021RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 09, 2021FORECLOSURE COVID-19 CONFERENCE STATUS FORM
Date: November 24, 2021EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 07, 2021ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 25, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: December 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 18, 2021NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: October 24, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 07, 2021OATH
Date: March 11, 2022ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE
Date: January 05, 2022REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE
Date: March 11, 2022BILL OF COSTS
Date: March 23, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 29, 2022JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: October 03, 2022EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 23, 2022JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: September 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 23, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 29, 2022EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: October 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2022 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
October 18, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #3) Ex Parte Application to Vacate Judgment of Foreclosure and sale and Cancelling Notice of Pendency of Ex Parte Application to Vacate Judgment of Foreclosure and sale and Cancelling Notice of Pendency of ... show more |
||
October 03, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
September 29, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 27, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
August 29, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 23, 2022 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
March 23, 2022 |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #2) Judgement of Foreclosure and Sale |
||
March 23, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2) Attorney affidavit in support of judgment of foreclosure and sale |
||
March 23, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2) Affidavit in Support of Claim for Attorney Fees |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.