Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jefferson Capital Systems, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, against Gene W Rhode, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 04, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 04, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 31, 2021AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 14, 2022AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY AFFIMRATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 14, 2022AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE AFFIRMATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 31, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: February 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 04, 2021AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
February 14, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
February 14, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY AFFIMRATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY AFFIMRATION Redacted |
||
February 14, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE AFFIRMATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE AFFIRMATION Redacted |
||
February 14, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR SOL AFFIRMATION Redacted |
||
August 04, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT ADDITIONAL NOTICE |
||
July 31, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 31, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 04, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT FZPR709800 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.