Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Serian, Robert Bruce, against Bondelie, Dorothy A., in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Raymond A. Guadagni presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 15, 2006 |
CategoryOther Contract Limited (37) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions94 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time94 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination 213510-Hearing: Order of Exam; LVNV Funding LLC vs. Bondelie, Dorothy A. ; Judge: J21220 Anton John N. Judge: Anton, John N. |
|
August 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
May 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment: Issued 227110-Abstract: Issued Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff ABSTRACT: ISSUED [227110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
May 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order of Exam: Issued/Filed 227220-Order of Exam Issued Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff ORDER OF EXAM ISSUED [227220] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
May 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 241110-Conference: Case Management; LVNV Funding LLC vs. Bondelie, Dorothy A. ; Judge: J21130 Guadagni Raymond A. Judge: Guadagni, Raymond A. |
|
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Declaration 213310-Declaration Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DECLARATION [213310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Default 226130-Judgment: Default Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff JUDGMENT: DEFAULT [226130] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Mar 19 2007 Type: 244210 - Judgment: Clerk Default Manner : 241210 - Before Trial: No Sttlmnt Cnf/ADR |
|
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request: Enter Default 229120-Request: Default Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff REQUEST: DEFAULT [229120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Dismissal 233910-Dismissal Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DISMISSAL [233910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.