Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Barreto, Jonathan Alexander, Flynn, Gerald W, Flynn, Kerri S, Sheerin, John J, against Michael Oppenheim, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts with Christopher P Baker presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
AFFIRMATION
Date: October 12, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 11, 2020NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: October 12, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 09, 2023ORDER - FINAL
Date: September 18, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 09, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 09, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 09, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 15, 2021ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: June 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 09, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: October 16, 2023NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: October 12, 2023STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: March 09, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 09, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 11, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 12, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION AFFIDAVIT AND NON MILITARY |
||
October 12, 2023 |
NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) NOT OF DEF LTR and STIPULATION |
||
October 12, 2023 |
NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) order with notice of entry |
||
September 18, 2023 | ORDER - FINAL | ||
August 09, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation and Non Military |
||
August 09, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1) Conformed Notice Of Motion |
||
August 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #1) proposed order |
||
August 09, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION PAGE |
||
August 09, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) affidavit of service and blueback |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.