Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Seneca Stone Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Wright, James Patrick, against Krp Trucking And Excavating Inc, in the jurisdiction of Chemung County, NY, . Chemung County, NY Superior Courts with Christopher P Baker presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions86 days |
Filing LocationChemung County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time86 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 26, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 24, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 26, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 07, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: May 20, 2020ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: December 08, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: December 03, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: October 13, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 13, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: July 15, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: June 26, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
December 08, 2020 | ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION | ||
December 04, 2020 | Hearing |
Granted (Motion #002)
Judge: Baker, Hon. Christopher P. |
|
December 03, 2020 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
October 15, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 14, 2020 | Motion |
Contempt (Motion #002) Decided: 12/04/2020Granted Before Justice: Baker, Hon. Christopher P. Answer demanded: No Judge: Baker, Hon. Christopher P. |
|
October 13, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service |
||
October 13, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #2) Deposition Subpoena |
||
October 13, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #2) Information Subpoena Responses |
||
October 13, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #2) Letter Mailing Decision and Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.