Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Barbara Przybycien, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Shemik, Nicholas James, Wood, Brian Russell, against Five Loaves And A Couple Of Fishes Inc, Laura Scudder, Mustard Seed, Robert Scudder, The Mustard Seed, (total of 5) See All represented by Brautigam, Daryl Paul, Habberfield, Melissa Beth, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Food Borne Illness) |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 30, 2021ANSWER
Date: December 15, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 05, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: June 13, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: April 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
April 18, 2023 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) | ||
December 15, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
November 05, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 30, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.