Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cavalry Portfolio Services, Llc Et. Al., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Winn, Brian Nevins, against Peck, Troy W., in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Raymond A. Guadagni presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2006 |
CategoryOther Contract Limited (37) - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time188 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 241110-Conference: Case Management; Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC vs. Peck, Troy W. ; Judge: J21130 Guadagni Raymond A. Judge: Guadagni, Raymond A. |
|
June 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Dismissal 233910-Dismissal Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DISMISSAL [233910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
June 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Jun 8 2007 Type: 243110 - Entry of Request for Dismissal Manner : 241210 - Before Trial: No Sttlmnt Cnf/ADR |
|
May 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
May 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 241110-Conference: Case Management; Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC vs. Peck, Troy W. ; Judge: J21130 Guadagni Raymond A. Judge: Guadagni, Raymond A. |
|
May 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference 231110-Statement: Case Man Conference Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff STATEMENT: CASE MAN CONFERENCE [231110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
March 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request: Enter Default 229120-Request: Default Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff REQUEST: DEFAULT [229120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
March 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Dismissal 233910-Dismissal Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DISMISSAL [233910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
March 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
March 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response 212410-Answer Filed/Issued By: 911120 - Defendant Pro Per ANSWER [212410] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By DEFENDANT PRO PER [911120] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.