Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Einstein, Stephen, against Kristin Mcchesney, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 06, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 06, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 06, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 29, 2021NOTICE
Date: November 13, 2020JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: July 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 29, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 29, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 04, 2020AFFIRMATION
Date: July 29, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: August 11, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
July 29, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Executed OCA Affidavit of Debt Buyer |
||
July 29, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) TMP#391655 |
||
July 29, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Executed OCA Affidavit of Orig Cred |
||
July 29, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 29, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
July 29, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Executed OCA Affidavit of Debt Seller |
||
November 13, 2020 | NOTICE | ||
November 04, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 06, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.