Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
City Of Jamestown, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Mancini, John A., Miller, Howard Marc, O'Neil, Terence Michael, Smith, Jacqueline Ann, against Kendall Club Police Benevolent Association, Inc., represented by De Angelo, Charles Salvatore, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts Chautauqua County Supreme Court with James Dillon presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2019 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
|
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
|
Filing Court HouseChautauqua County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time595 days |
RECORD ON APPEAL (COPY)
Date: August 28, 2020RECORD ON APPEAL (COPY)
Date: August 28, 2020RECORD ON APPEAL (COPY)
Date: August 28, 2020APPELLATE DECISION AND/OR ORDER (COPY)
Date: August 28, 2020ORDER - FINAL (Motion #2)
Date: April 29, 2019RECORD ON APPEAL (COPY)
Date: August 28, 2020RECORD ON APPEAL (COPY)
Date: August 28, 2020RECORD ON APPEAL (COPY)
Date: August 28, 2020RECORD ON APPEAL (COPY)
Date: August 28, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 29, 2019NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #1)
Date: May 01, 2019ORDER - AMENDED (Motion #3)
Date: April 23, 2019ORDER - FINAL (Motion #3)
Date: April 03, 2019ORDER - FINAL (Motion #3)
Date: April 02, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1)
Date: March 26, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3)
Date: March 25, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #3)
Date: March 25, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)
Date: March 15, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2)
Date: March 15, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3)
Date: March 14, 2019ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING (Motion #1)
Date: March 08, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: February 25, 2019MEMORANDUM
Date: February 20, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)
Date: February 19, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) *Corrected*
Date: February 20, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3)
Date: February 19, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #3)
Date: February 08, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: February 08, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: February 08, 2019SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: February 08, 2019ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING
Date: February 08, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: January 11, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: January 11, 2019NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #1)
Date: January 11, 2019PETITION
Date: January 11, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
RECORD ON APPEAL (COPY) VOL I |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
RECORD ON APPEAL (COPY) VOL VII |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
RECORD ON APPEAL (COPY) VOL VI |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | APPELLATE DECISION AND/OR ORDER (COPY) | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
RECORD ON APPEAL (COPY) VOL V |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
RECORD ON APPEAL (COPY) VOL IV |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
RECORD ON APPEAL (COPY) VOL III |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
RECORD ON APPEAL (COPY) VOL II |
|
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry and 06/12/20 Order of Appellate Division, Fourth Dept. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.