Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Greater Woodlawn Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Ilecki, William, Ostrowski, Melissa, against Joshua P Perez, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts Chautauqua County Supreme Court with James Dillon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames Dillon Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions281 days |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseChautauqua County Supreme Court |
RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)
Date: August 19, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: October 10, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 08, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)
Date: August 19, 2019EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)
Date: August 19, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 25, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 11, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 29, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 31, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | |
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1) | |
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1) | |
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1) | |
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) military status |
|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) affidavit of service |
|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) summons and complaint |
|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) attorney fee provision |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.