Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Erie Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Elliott, Ericka Bliss, against Onda M Cole, Richard F Cole, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts Chautauqua County Supreme Court with James Dillon presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 25, 2018 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
|
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
|
Filing Court HouseChautauqua County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time36 days |
PETITION
Date: June 25, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1)
Date: July 09, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1)
Date: July 31, 2018ORDER - FINAL (Motion #1)
Date: July 30, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 18, 2018RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 25, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: June 25, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)
Date: June 25, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - FINAL (Motion #1) | |
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Order |
|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) | |
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event | PETITION | |
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | |
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E SUM Endorsement |
|
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Auto Insurance Policy |
|
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.