Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Keybank, National Association Successor By Merger With First Niagara Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Confusione, Lisa M, against Allison M. Futch As Possible Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of Janet M. Warner A K A Janet Marilyn Warner, Amy L. Morrison As Executrix Of The Estate Of Janet M. Warner A K A Janet Marilyn Warner, Bruce W. Barker As Possible Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of Janet M. Warner A K A Janet Marilyn Warner, Chrysler Financial Services Americas Llc F K A Daimler Chrysler Financial Services Americas Llc, Elizabeth A. Barker As Possible Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of Janet M. Warner A K A Janet Marilyn Warner, (total of 12) See All represented by Cerrone, Michael Salvatore, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts with Stephen Cass presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen Cass Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions415 days |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Case Cycle Time525 days |
Allison M. Futch As Possible Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of Janet M. Warner A K A Janet Marilyn Warner
Bruce W. Barker As Possible Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of Janet M. Warner A K A Janet Marilyn Warner
Elizabeth A. Barker As Possible Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of Janet M. Warner A K A Janet Marilyn Warner
John Doe #1 Through John Doe #20, The Last Twenty Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises
Molly J. Mathis As Possible Heir And Distributee Of The Estate Of Janet M. Warner A K A Janet Marilyn Warner
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: April 23, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 31, 2017ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE
Date: September 26, 2018LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 08, 2018EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 06, 2018JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: December 20, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 14, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 06, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 15, 2017NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: December 14, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: October 31, 2017CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: October 31, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 21, 2017AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: April 23, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 23, 2018AFFIRMATION
Date: April 23, 2018AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 23, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 14, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 21, 2017RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: January 05, 2018ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: January 05, 2018NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: October 31, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 21, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 23, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 23, 2018COURT NOTICE
Date: February 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 23, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 21, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 30, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 30, 2017BILL OF COSTS Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 06, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 08, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 23, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 23, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 23, 2018NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: March 23, 2018ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: February 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 23, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 06, 2018OATH
Date: April 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 23, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 23, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: March 08, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 23, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 23, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 25, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 23, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 06, 2018TERMS OF SALE
Date: April 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 06, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 15, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #2) *Corrected*
Date: January 15, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 06, 2018NOTICE OF SALE
Date: January 18, 2019REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: April 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 06, 2018FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: April 09, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: April 09, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2019 | OATH | ||
April 09, 2019 | TERMS OF SALE | ||
April 09, 2019 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
April 09, 2019 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
April 09, 2019 | AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION | ||
January 18, 2019 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
January 15, 2019 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Please see Affidavit of Mailing for the Notice of Enrty for the Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
||
January 15, 2019 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) *Corrected* Please see Notice of Entry for the Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
||
December 20, 2018 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
November 06, 2018 |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #2) Proposed Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.