Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Catherine J. Tadt, Scott R. Tadt, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Maloney, Patrick J., against James P. Fitzgerald M.D., John J. Lobianco P.A., Kevin M. Ouweleen M.D., Lakeshore Orthopedic Group, P.C., represented by Markel, Katherine Veith, Ricotta, Kevin Alan, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Superior Courts with Grace Hanlon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGrace Hanlon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 31, 2017 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedNovember 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) by Mail of NOE with Order |
||
November 17, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
November 09, 2021 | ORDER - FINAL | ||
October 22, 2021 |
ORDER - OTHER ORDER SIGNED BY THE JUDGE |
||
October 20, 2021 |
STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Amending Caption |
||
October 13, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Decision & Order |
||
October 13, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
July 09, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
June 25, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
June 17, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.