Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Fredonia Temple Brigham Apartments Llc, Park Place Collegiate Apartments, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Ilecki, William, against Alexander Burchett, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts with Grace Hanlon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 18, 2014 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING
Date: August 05, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: April 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 04, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: March 31, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 08, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: March 09, 2023JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: March 09, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 08, 2023ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: March 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
April 04, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 31, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 09, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
March 09, 2023 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
March 08, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 08, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
March 08, 2023 | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | ||
February 04, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 04, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - b (Motion #2) filed notice of entry of order and affirmation of mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.