Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Slm Education Credit Finance Corporation, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Damsky, Edward Jay, against Donald S Mccurdy, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts with Grace Hanlon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2013 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: September 29, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 30, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT (FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID)
Date: September 29, 2022EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 30, 2022APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING
Date: September 29, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 03, 2013EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 30, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 25, 2013OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 05, 2014AFFIRMATION
Date: February 05, 2014RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 30, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 05, 2014ORDER - VACATING JUDGMENT
Date: November 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2022 | ORDER - VACATING JUDGMENT | ||
September 30, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION |
||
September 30, 2022 |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) EXPARTE ORDER |
||
September 30, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) ENTERED JUDGMENT |
||
September 30, 2022 |
RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION |
||
September 29, 2022 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION | ||
September 29, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT (FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID) | ||
September 29, 2022 | APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING | ||
February 05, 2014 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT-FILED |
||
February 05, 2014 | AFFIRMATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.