Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, against Bienvenida Levier, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 04, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 21, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: August 17, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 12, 2022AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 12, 2022AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 12, 2022NOTICE
Date: August 27, 2021AFFIRMATION DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 12, 2022AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 12, 2022AFFIDAVIT ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 12, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 21, 2021AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 12, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
July 12, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
July 12, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
July 12, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
July 12, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
July 12, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
July 12, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
July 12, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
August 27, 2021 | NOTICE | ||
August 21, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.