Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Crown Asset Management Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Alicia M Grimes, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 20, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 20, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: November 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 11, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: November 11, 2021NOTICE
Date: April 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 11, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: November 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 11, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
November 11, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Executed OCA Affidavit of Orig Cred |
||
November 11, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) TMP#400703 |
||
November 11, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Executed OCA Affidavit of Debt Buyer |
||
November 11, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 12, 2021 | NOTICE | ||
April 07, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 20, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
January 20, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.