Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Jordan, Tarah Eve, Leiderman, Joel D, against Dawn Quiter, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 10, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: October 08, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 22, 2020NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: December 08, 2020NOTICE
Date: August 25, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 22, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 10, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2020 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE OF DISCONTINUING ACTION |
||
October 08, 2020 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
August 25, 2020 | NOTICE | ||
August 22, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 22, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 10, 2020 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT E313194388475 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.