Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Reverse Mortgage Funding Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., Frank, Thomas J., Silver, Jason David, against Helen J Bell, Secretary Of Housing And Urban, United States Of America, represented by Fleming, Mary Enright, in the jurisdiction of Chautauqua County, NY, . Chautauqua County, NY Superior Courts Chautauqua County Supreme Court with Stephen Cass presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen Cass Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationChautauqua County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseChautauqua County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time57 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 09, 2018NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 14, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 06, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: February 09, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 10, 2022RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: June 14, 2022SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: December 14, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 21, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 06, 2022CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: December 14, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 06, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 06, 2022SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 06, 2022FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM
Date: July 25, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: June 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 06, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: June 27, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 24, 2022ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: June 14, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 10, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 17, 2020CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: January 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 06, 2022ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE
Date: January 31, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: December 14, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2023 | ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE | ||
December 06, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation in Support of Motion |
||
December 06, 2022 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Order of Reference and Default Judgment |
||
December 06, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Note and home equity conversion loan agreement |
||
December 06, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion for an Order of Reference |
||
December 06, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Certificate of Merit N/A |
||
December 06, 2022 |
SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #1) Redaction Cover page |
||
December 06, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Assignments |
||
December 06, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Mortgage |
||
December 06, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #1) Affidavit of Merit and Amount Due |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.