Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Americu Credit Union, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sanda, Gregory James, against Auburn City Court, Dante M. Phillips Johnson, John Doe #1- #50 And Mary Roe #1- #50, The Last Two Names Being Fictitious, It Being Intended To Name All Other Parties Who May Have Some Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Described In The Complaint, Sustainable Neighborhoods Llc, in the jurisdiction of Cayuga County, NY, . Cayuga County, NY Superior Courts with Thomas G Leone presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCayuga County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This legal document is a foreclosure summons and complaint filed by Americu Credit Union against Dante M. Phillips Johnson and other defendants. Americu Credit Union alleges that Dante M. Phillips Johnson failed to comply with the terms of a mortgage...
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 09, 2024ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: January 08, 2024AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 11, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 08, 2024CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: December 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 08, 2024RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 08, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 08, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E 90 Day Demands
Date: December 12, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: December 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: December 12, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT SRJI AOM |
||
January 09, 2024 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
January 08, 2024 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
January 08, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE No Does |
||
January 08, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - DANTE M. PHILLIPS JOHNSON |
||
January 08, 2024 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
January 08, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 - DANTE M. PHILLIPS JOHNSON |
||
December 27, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AUBURN CITY COURT |
||
December 20, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 20, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS SUSTAINABLE NEIGHBORHOODS, LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.