Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Empower Federal Credit Union,, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Partridge, Jill Mary, Shaw, Amanda C, against Darcie Yellock A K A Darcie L. Yellock, Jane Doe, John Doe, Mariner Finance, Llc, Midland Credit Management, Inc., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Cayuga County, NY, . Cayuga County, NY Superior Courts with Thomas G Leone presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 25, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCayuga County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 19, 2023EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #01)
Date: October 19, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #01)
Date: October 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: October 19, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 25, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 25, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: May 25, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: May 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 19, 2023 |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #01) Order of Reference |
||
October 19, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #01) Affirmation of no answer and that notice of pendency has been filed |
||
October 19, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
August 17, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
August 03, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
August 03, 2023 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
August 03, 2023 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
August 03, 2023 | Affidavit of Mailing | ||
July 10, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.