Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Credit Acceptance Corporation, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shur, Joseph M, against Rob M Moody, in the jurisdiction of Cayuga County, NY, . Cayuga County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 22, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCayuga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: May 22, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 03, 2023 | affidavit of compliance | ||
October 03, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT non military affidavit |
||
October 03, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION statue of limitations affirmation |
||
October 03, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION Attorney affirmation of facts |
||
October 03, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
August 11, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
June 08, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A retail installment contract |
||
May 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B notice of deficiency |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.