Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Centier Bank Assignee, Triad Financial Services Inc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shaw, Amanda C, against Orie C Bush, in the jurisdiction of Cayuga County, NY, . Cayuga County, NY Superior Courts with Thomas G Leone presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCayuga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 30, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 31, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: March 31, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 30, 2021ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: May 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 31, 2022EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: November 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: November 30, 2021ORDER - SEIZURE
Date: May 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: December 06, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 30, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #01) Affidavit of Mailing copies of filed orders |
||
May 19, 2022 | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | ||
May 19, 2022 | ORDER - SEIZURE | ||
March 31, 2022 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #01) Order of Seizure |
||
March 31, 2022 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | ||
March 31, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #01) Attorney Affidavit |
||
March 31, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A-I (Motion #01) Contract, Assignment, Lien, Demand Letter, Summons and complaint with exhibits A-D, affidavit of ser Contract, Assignment, Lien, Demand Letter, Summons and complaint with exhibits A-D, affidavit of ser ... show more |
||
March 31, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #01) Attorney Fee Affidavit |
||
March 31, 2022 |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #01) Order and Judgment |
||
March 31, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #01) Plaintiff Affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.