Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Susan J Cole, Susan J Stallman, Susan Karafiat, in the jurisdiction of Cayuga County, NY, . Cayuga County, NY Superior Courts with Thomas G Leone presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 29, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCayuga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 29, 2021REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: January 20, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: October 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #01)
Date: October 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 20, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 20, 2021ANSWER
Date: December 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #01)
Date: October 06, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: October 06, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #01)
Date: October 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #01)
Date: October 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 29, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #01)
Date: October 06, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: October 06, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 06, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 11, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: October 06, 2022SUR-REPLY
Date: December 09, 2022ANSWER
Date: December 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2022 | SUR-REPLY | ||
December 05, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
October 11, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 06, 2022 | STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
October 06, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #01) Summons |
||
October 06, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #01) Affidavit of Service |
||
October 06, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
October 06, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
October 06, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #01) Answer |
||
October 06, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #01) Reply to Counterclaim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.