Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Newrez Llc, Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing Dba, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against John Doe 1-12 1-John Doe 12 The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff,The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corps, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises, Described In The Complaint, Kevin S Combs, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, M&T Mortgage Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Cayuga County, NY, . Cayuga County, NY Superior Courts with Thomas G Leone presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 22, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCayuga County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 22, 2021FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: October 26, 2023JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: June 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #02)
Date: March 15, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #02)
Date: March 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #02)
Date: February 08, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: February 07, 2023NOTICE OF SALE
Date: August 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #02)
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #02)
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #02)
Date: February 07, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #02)
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #02)
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #02)
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #02)
Date: February 07, 2023BILL OF COSTS Â (Motion #02)
Date: February 07, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #02)
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #02)
Date: February 07, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: December 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #02)
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #02)
Date: February 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 17, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #02)
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #02)
Date: February 07, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: September 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #02)
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #02)
Date: February 07, 2023ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE
Date: August 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #02)
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #02)
Date: February 07, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: March 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #02)
Date: February 07, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: August 10, 2022ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: March 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 14, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 26, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 03, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 03, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 03, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: November 22, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 14, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 03, 2022SUMMONS & COMPLAINT W/PROOF OF SVC OF HARDSHIP DECL. & AFF. STATING NO RECEIPT OF HARDSHIP DECL.
Date: November 22, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: November 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #02)
Date: February 07, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #02)
Date: February 07, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 03, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2023 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
October 26, 2023 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
August 01, 2023 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
June 29, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service |
||
June 29, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Order Confirming Referee Report and Judgement of Foreclosure and Sale |
||
June 08, 2023 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
March 15, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #02) Affirmation of Service |
||
March 15, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #02) Amended Notice of Motion for an Order Confirming Referee Report and Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
||
February 08, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #02) Affirmation of Service |
||
February 07, 2023 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.