Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Kerry Norris, Moravia Veterinary Hospital, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Arthur Bell Jr, Bell Construction Company Llc, represented by Shah, Syed Omar, in the jurisdiction of Cayuga County, NY, . Cayuga County, NY Superior Courts with Thomas G Leone presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 16, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCayuga County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #02)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #01)
Date: January 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - "A" Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 04, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #02)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - "B" Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 04, 2022ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: March 07, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #01)
Date: January 05, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #01)
Date: January 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #01)
Date: January 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-C
Date: November 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D-L
Date: November 16, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #01)
Date: January 05, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M-P
Date: November 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #01)
Date: January 05, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: May 13, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 13, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 04, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 10, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: May 13, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 19, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #01)
Date: January 05, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #02)
Date: March 22, 2022ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: January 05, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-E Â (Motion #02) *Corrected*
Date: April 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - "C" Â (Motion #02)
Date: April 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 21, 2022DECISION ON MOTION -SUBMIT ORD / JGMT
Date: May 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - "E" Â (Motion #02)
Date: April 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #02)
Date: April 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - "D" Â (Motion #02)
Date: April 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-F Â (Motion #02) *Corrected*
Date: April 01, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: April 01, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: January 07, 2022ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: May 08, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: April 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #03)
Date: September 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #03)
Date: September 19, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: November 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #03)
Date: September 19, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 21, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED | ||
September 19, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
September 19, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #03) Affidavit of Carl J. DePalma, Esq. |
||
September 19, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #03) Affidavit of Service and Information Subpoena |
||
September 19, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #03) Judgment |
||
August 10, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
May 13, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
May 13, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
May 13, 2022 | JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.