Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cat Iv Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Brandimarte, Luigi, against J James Estate Of S, Rickie As Admin C, represented by Mastrantonio, Steven Walter, in the jurisdiction of Cayuga County, NY, . Cayuga County, NY Superior Courts with Mark H Fandrich presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 11, 2020 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Sale/Transfer) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions101 days |
Filing LocationCayuga County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
|
Case Cycle Time158 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 13, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #02-A) Settlement Agreement Affidavit
Date: August 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #02-A)
Date: August 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #02-A)
Date: August 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #02-A)
Date: August 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #02-A)
Date: August 18, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 16, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 13, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 16, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #02-A)
Date: August 18, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #02)
Date: September 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: May 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: May 11, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)
Date: May 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #01)
Date: August 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: May 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: May 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #02-A)
Date: August 18, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 13, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #02-A)
Date: August 18, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 21, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #02-A)
Date: August 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: May 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: May 11, 2020NOTICE OF FILING DURING THE COVID-19 PUBLIC HEALTH EMERGENCY
Date: May 11, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: May 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: May 11, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 15, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: August 21, 2020ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #02-A)
Date: August 20, 2020PETITION (AMENDED)
Date: August 19, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 20, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 18, 2020RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 11, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: May 11, 2020PETITION
Date: May 11, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 16, 2020 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
October 15, 2020 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
October 13, 2020 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
October 13, 2020 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
October 13, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 13, 2020 | Hearing |
Granted (Motion #002)
Judge: Fandrich, Hon. Mark H. |
|
September 10, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #02) Exhibit "E" to Petition - Amended Disclosure Statement |
||
August 24, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #02-A) Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
August 21, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #01) Copy of Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.