Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bank Of New York Mellon As Trustee, Nationstar Home Equity Loan Trust 2007 B, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against Above All Construction Dba, Lee Cordway, Stephen W Leroy, in the jurisdiction of Cayuga County, NY, . Cayuga County, NY Superior Courts with Thomas G Leone presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 16, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCayuga County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: November 16, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: February 03, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: June 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 03, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 03, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI)
Date: April 07, 2022CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: November 16, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 03, 2022FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: August 25, 2023JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: May 05, 2022REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: September 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2023 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
August 25, 2023 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
June 14, 2023 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
August 03, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service |
||
August 03, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Order Confirming Referee Report and Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
||
May 05, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
April 07, 2022 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI) | ||
February 03, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
February 03, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
November 16, 2021 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.