Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Clarke, Elizabeth Ann, Jakas, Joseph Karl, Verhagen, Jason Peter, against Aimee E Newton, in the jurisdiction of Cayuga County, NY, . Cayuga County, NY Superior Courts with Thomas G Leone presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas G Leone Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 29, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCayuga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 29, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 02, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 02, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: December 05, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #01)
Date: December 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #01)
Date: December 02, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 27, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: December 02, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 02, 2022ANSWER
Date: May 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #01)
Date: December 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #01)
Date: December 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #01)
Date: December 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 27, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS Â (Motion #01)
Date: December 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #01)
Date: December 07, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO CLERK
Date: December 13, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: January 09, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: January 09, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 01, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE PRO SE DEFENDANT REQUESTING 2 WEEK EXTENSION SO STIP OF DISC CAN BE FILED |
||
January 09, 2023 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
January 09, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
December 13, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO CLERK | ||
December 07, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #01) NOTICE OF COURT DATE to DEFENDANT |
||
December 07, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01) Aff of Service for MSJ Additional Mailing Notice mailed to Court |
||
December 05, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
December 02, 2022 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
December 02, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 02, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.