Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
American Advisors Group, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bhatia, Raspreet, Greenberg, Sarah Joanne, against John Doe 1-10, Thomas Christian Hulbeck Estate Of, Thomas C Hulbeck Estate Of, United States Of America On Behalf Of Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, William Burke Rosbrook As Admin, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Cayuga County, NY, . Cayuga County, NY Superior Courts with Thomas G Leone presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCayuga County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 24, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #02)
Date: September 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #02)
Date: September 24, 2021CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #02)
Date: September 24, 2021ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: February 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 24, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 02, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: September 28, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: December 03, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #02)
Date: September 24, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: August 24, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISCONTINUE
Date: September 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
May 02, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 24, 2022 | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
January 25, 2022 | Hearing |
(Motion #002)
Judge: Leone, Hon. Thomas G. |
|
December 03, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
September 28, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
September 24, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
September 24, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
September 24, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #02) Notice of Pendency |
||
September 24, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #02) Notice of Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.