Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Cayuga County. This case was filed in Cayuga County Superior Courts with Mark H. Fandrich presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 17, 2013 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationCayuga County, NY |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2014 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Fandrich (Motion Part) Judge: Fandrich, Hon. Mark H. |
|
June 11, 2014 | Hearing |
Decided Fandrich (Court Activity) Judge: Fandrich, Hon. Mark H. |
|
June 09, 2014 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #002) Fandrich (Motion Part) Judge: Fandrich, Hon. Mark H. |
|
June 09, 2014 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #002) Fandrich (Motion Part) Judge: Fandrich, Hon. Mark H. |
|
June 09, 2014 | Motion |
(Motion #002) Decided: 06/11/2014Decided Before Justice: Fandrich, Hon. Mark H. Answer demanded: No Judge: Fandrich, Hon. Mark H. |
|
November 26, 2013 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #001) Fandrich (Motion Part) Judge: Fandrich, Hon. Mark H. |
|
November 26, 2013 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Fandrich (Motion Part) Judge: Fandrich, Hon. Mark H. |
|
November 26, 2013 | Hearing |
Held Fandrich (Hearing) Judge: Fandrich, Hon. Mark H. |
|
November 13, 2013 | Hearing |
Held Fandrich (Hearing) Judge: Fandrich, Hon. Mark H. |
|
November 06, 2013 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #001) Fandrich (Motion Part) Judge: Fandrich, Hon. Mark H. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.