Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Cayuga County, NY, . Cayuga County, NY Superior Courts with Fandrich, Hon. Mark H. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management46 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2016 |
CategoryMat-Contested |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationCayuga County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time402 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2017 | Hearing |
Post-Judgment Fandrich (Court Activity) Judge: Fandrich, Hon. Mark H. |
|
November 16, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Fandrich (Hearing) Judge: Fandrich, Hon. Mark H. |
|
October 30, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Fandrich (Hearing) Judge: Fandrich, Hon. Mark H. |
|
October 10, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Fandrich (Hearing) Judge: Fandrich, Hon. Mark H. |
|
July 25, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Fandrich (Hearing) Judge: Fandrich, Hon. Mark H. |
|
July 18, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Fandrich (Hearing) Judge: Fandrich, Hon. Mark H. |
|
June 27, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Screening Part (Hearing) Judge: Screening Part 7th, Matrimonial |
|
June 23, 2017 | Hearing |
Note of Issue Filed Fandrich (Court Activity) Judge: Fandrich, Hon. Mark H. |
|
June 13, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Screening Part (Hearing) Judge: Screening Part 7th, Matrimonial |
|
June 01, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Screening Part (Hearing) Judge: Screening Part 7th, Matrimonial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.