Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rocket Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Rogers, Heather C, against Alicia A Minerd Zwieg, And John Doe And Mary Doe,, John Minerd Estate, Massey Jessica A Minerd A K A, Massey Jessica Minerd A K A, (total of 11) See All in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts with Terrence M. Parker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerrence M. Parker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 17, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: May 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 10, 2022AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY
Date: August 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 10, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: August 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 03, 2022ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: August 10, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 03, 2022EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: May 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: May 03, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 03, 2023ORDER - SERVICE BY PUBLICATION
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A SCRA Search Results Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 28, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: May 19, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 17, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: May 17, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A SCRA Search Results Redacted per 22 NYCRR SCRA Search Results Redacted |
||
June 28, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT Military Status Affidavit |
||
May 03, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION The Salamanca Press |
||
May 03, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION OLEAN TIMES HERALD |
||
May 03, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 09, 2023 | ORDER - SERVICE BY PUBLICATION | ||
August 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Copy of Summons & Complaint/ Copy of Notice of Pendency |
||
August 10, 2022 | AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY | ||
August 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Death Certificate |
||
August 10, 2022 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.