Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Toby G Barber, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Mahoney, Kevin Scott, against Ronda J Barber, Rhonda J Barber, in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts with Ronald D Ploetz presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 04, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
July 06, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
July 06, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | ||
June 08, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
June 06, 2022 |
CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
June 06, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
June 06, 2022 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
June 06, 2022 | RETAINER AGREEMENT | ||
June 03, 2022 | AFFIRMATION (AFFIDAVIT) OF REGULARITY | ||
June 03, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.