Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Castle Companies, Inc., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Jackson, Pamela Curulewski, against Chambless, Analee, Chambless, Veronica, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with J. Michael Byrne presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 14, 2006 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer Residential Limited (32) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions25 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time25 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Writ (Filed) 236120-Writ: Filed Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff WRIT: FILED [236120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
January 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
Writ (Issued) 236110-Writ: Issued Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff WRIT: ISSUED [236110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Jan 8 2007 Type: 244710 - Judgment: Court Finding Manner : 251110 - After Court Trial |
|
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment 226110-Judgment Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff JUDGMENT [226110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Court Trial: Short Cause 251110-Court Trial: Short Cause; Castle Companies, Inc. vs. Chambless, A. et al ; Judge: J21216 Byrne J. Michael Judge: Byrne, J. Michael |
|
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver Denied 211150-Fee Waiver Order-Deny Filed/Issued By: 911120 - Defendant Pro Per FEE WAIVER ORDER-DENY [211150] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By DEFENDANT PRO PER [911120] |
|
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 212310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 911120 - Defendant Pro Per PROOF OF SERVICE [212310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By DEFENDANT PRO PER [911120] |
|
December 22, 2006 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
December 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response 212410-Answer Filed/Issued By: 911120 - Defendant Pro Per ANSWER [212410] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By DEFENDANT PRO PER [911120] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.