Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bank America N A, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Wayne P Wiedemann, in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts with Ronald D Ploetz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald D Ploetz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 20, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 09, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 09, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: May 20, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 29, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 29, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: January 05, 2022CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: April 26, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 29, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 04, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 04, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 29, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 29, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 29, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 04, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: May 19, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 29, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 04, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1290142 |
||
January 04, 2022 |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) SUMMARY JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1290142 |
||
January 04, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1290142 |
||
June 09, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 09, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
June 04, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
May 20, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) AMENDED EXHIBIT E - SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT |
||
May 20, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - COURT NOTICE DATED 05/19/2021 |
||
May 20, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - AMENDED EXHIBIT E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.