We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Joshua E Willover V. Kenneth G Reiss, Erlon Ross Shaffer

Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago

Joshua E Willover, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Hellwig, Adam Christopher, against Erlon Ross Shaffer, Kenneth G Reiss, represented by Deisinger, Adam Patrick, Mccormick, Paul David, in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts with Terrence M. Parker presiding.

Case Details for Joshua E Willover v. Erlon Ross Shaffer , et al.

Judge

Terrence M. Parker Track Judge’s New Cases

Filing Date

April 26, 2018

Category

Torts - Other Negligence (Personal Injury)

Last Refreshed

October 10, 2023

Practice Area

Torts

Filing Location

Cattaraugus County, NY

Matter Type

Personal Injury

Parties for Joshua E Willover v. Erlon Ross Shaffer , et al.

Plaintiffs

Joshua E Willover

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Hellwig, Adam Christopher

Defendants

Erlon Ross Shaffer

Kenneth G Reiss

Attorneys for Defendants

Deisinger, Adam Patrick

Mccormick, Paul David

Case Documents for Joshua E Willover v. Erlon Ross Shaffer , et al.

NOTICE OF MOTION

Date: July 10, 2020

COMPLAINT (AMENDED)

Date: March 06, 2020

NOTICE OF MOTION

Date: January 14, 2020

Case Events for Joshua E Willover v. Erlon Ross Shaffer , et al.

Type Description
MEMORANDUM
Hearing PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
CATTARAUGUS COU (Prelim. Conference)
Held

Judge: THE CATTARAUGUS COUNTY CENTER, LITTLE VA

NOTICE OF ENTRY
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Hearing RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001)
PARKER (Motion Part)

Judge: HON. TERRANCE M. PARKER

Hearing MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001)
PARKER (Motion Part)

Judge: HON. TERRANCE M. PARKER

Hearing PRE-MOTION PLAINTIFF
PARKER (Court Activity)
Held

Judge: HON. TERRANCE M. PARKER

Motion DECISION AND ORDER (Motion #001)
Decided: 09/01/2020GRANTED SIGNED AND UPLOADED;PE Before Justice: HON. TERRANCE M. PARKER
Answer demanded: No

Judge: HON. TERRANCE M. PARKER

Hearing MOTION FILED (Motion #001)
PARKER (Motion Part)

Judge: HON. TERRANCE M. PARKER

Hearing RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #006)
PARKER (Motion Part)

Judge: HON. TERRANCE M. PARKER

See all events