Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts with HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2015 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time545 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2015 | Hearing |
SETTLED: LOAN MODIFICATION NENNO (Settlement Conference) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
September 29, 2015 | Hearing |
PRE-DISMISSED NENNO (Court Activity) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
September 02, 2015 | Hearing |
NENNO (Settlement Conference)
Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
August 05, 2015 | Hearing |
CONTINUED NENNO (Settlement Conference) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
June 03, 2015 | Hearing |
NENNO (Settlement Conference)
Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
May 06, 2015 | Hearing |
NENNO (Settlement Conference)
Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
February 04, 2015 | Hearing |
NENNO (Settlement Conference)
Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
January 07, 2015 | Hearing |
CONTINUED NENNO (Settlement Conference) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
December 03, 2014 | Hearing |
NENNO (Settlement Conference)
Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
November 12, 2014 | Hearing |
CONTINUED NENNO (Settlement Conference) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.