Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County. This case was filed in Cattaraugus County Superior Courts with Jeremiah J. Moriarty presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2017 |
CategoryUncontested Matrimonial |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time658 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2018 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) MORIARTY, ESQ (Motion Part) Judge: HON.JEREMIAH J. MORIARTY |
|
October 09, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) MORIARTY, ESQ (Motion Part) Judge: HON.JEREMIAH J. MORIARTY |
|
September 28, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) MORIARTY, ESQ (Motion Part) Judge: HON.JEREMIAH J. MORIARTY |
|
September 28, 2018 | Motion |
QDRO ORDER (Motion #002) Decided: 10/09/2018GRANTED SIGNED AND T/C TO PLTF Before Justice: HON.JEREMIAH J. MORIARTY Answer demanded: No Judge: HON.JEREMIAH J. MORIARTY |
|
January 17, 2017 | Hearing |
PRE-SETTLED MORIARTY, ESQ (Court Activity) Judge: HON.JEREMIAH J. MORIARTY |
|
January 17, 2017 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) MORIARTY, ESQ (Motion Part) Judge: HON.JEREMIAH J. MORIARTY |
|
January 17, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) MORIARTY, ESQ (Motion Part) Judge: HON.JEREMIAH J. MORIARTY |
|
December 20, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) MORIARTY, ESQ (Motion Part) Judge: HON.JEREMIAH J. MORIARTY |
|
December 20, 2016 | Motion |
JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (Motion #001) Decided: 01/17/2017GRANTED SIGNED AND ORDER TO CO Before Justice: HON.JEREMIAH J. MORIARTY Answer demanded: No Judge: HON.JEREMIAH J. MORIARTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.