Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County. This case was filed in Cattaraugus County Superior Courts with TIMOTHY J. WALKER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 06, 2014 |
CategoryCommercial Div-Insurance Cases |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2021 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2014 | Hearing |
PRE-SETTLED WALKER (Court Activity) Judge: TIMOTHY J. WALKER |
|
October 06, 2014 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE WALKER (Prelim. Conference) Judge: TIMOTHY J. WALKER |
|
July 29, 2014 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE WALKER (Prelim. Conference) Judge: TIMOTHY J. WALKER |
|
March 26, 2014 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE WALKER (Prelim. Conference) Judge: TIMOTHY J. WALKER |
|
March 06, 2014 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE WALKER (Prelim. Conference) Judge: TIMOTHY J. WALKER |
|
December 10, 2013 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE WALKER (Prelim. Conference) Judge: TIMOTHY J. WALKER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.