Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Nyva Vestal Pizza Llc, West Vest Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Sheppard, Paul Thomas, against Assessor Of The Town Of Vestal, New York, Town Of Vestal, New York, in the jurisdiction of Broome County, NY, . Broome County, NY Superior Courts with Jeffrey Tait presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationBroome County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 31, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 31, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 31, 2023PETITION
Date: July 31, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 31, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 02, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER Order and Settlement Agreement |
||
August 16, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Personal Service |
||
August 16, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing |
||
August 11, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Order and Settlement Agreement |
||
August 02, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE WITH MOTION FILED |
||
July 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B: 2023 Notice of Determination |
||
July 31, 2023 |
NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1) 2023 Notice of Application |
||
July 31, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION | ||
July 31, 2023 |
PETITION 2023 Petition |
||
July 31, 2023 | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.