Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
U.S. Bank National Association As Trustee For J.P. Morgan Alternative Loan Trust 2006-S3 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against Adrian Skarvinko, Barbara Skarvinko, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #12 The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Subject Property Described In The Complaint,, in the jurisdiction of Broome County, NY, . Broome County, NY Superior Courts Broome County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 24, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationBroome County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseBroome County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time57 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 24, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 24, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 11, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-RAHUL MUNOD AS JOHN DOE #1 |
|
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-AKSHAY JAIN AS JOHN DOE #2 |
|
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING 3215-RAHUL MUNOD AS JOHN DOE #1 |
|
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS |
|
November 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
|
November 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-AKSHAY JAIN AS JOHN DOE #2 |
|
November 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-JENIL SHAH AS JOHN DOE #3 |
|
November 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-RAHEEL REYHUNATHAN AS JOHN DOE #6 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.