Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Broome County, NY, . Broome County, NY Superior Courts with Smith, Hon. Martin E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSmith, Hon. Martin E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 27, 2015 |
CategoryRp-Mortgage Foreclosure-Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroome County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time279 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2015 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Smith (Motion Part) Judge: Smith, Hon. Martin E. |
|
December 31, 2015 | Hearing |
Pre-Judgment Smith (Court Activity) Judge: Smith, Hon. Martin E. |
|
December 01, 2015 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #002) Smith (Motion Part) Judge: Smith, Hon. Martin E. |
|
December 01, 2015 | Motion |
(Motion #002) Decided: 12/31/2015Decided Before Justice: Smith, Hon. Martin E. Answer demanded: No Judge: Smith, Hon. Martin E. |
|
August 27, 2015 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Smith (Motion Part) Judge: Smith, Hon. Martin E. |
|
August 19, 2015 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #001) Smith (Motion Part) Judge: Smith, Hon. Martin E. |
|
August 19, 2015 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 08/27/2015Decided Before Justice: Smith, Hon. Martin E. Answer demanded: No Judge: Smith, Hon. Martin E. |
|
April 24, 2015 | Hearing |
Not Eligible Smith (Settlement Conference) Judge: Smith, Hon. Martin E. |
|
March 27, 2015 | Hearing |
Continued Smith (Settlement Conference) Judge: Smith, Hon. Martin E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.