Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Us Bank National Association, As Trustee For Cmlti 2006-Wf2, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Grigg, Natalie Ann, Kumiega, Brian B, against Dominick Saia, John Doe, in the jurisdiction of Broome County. This case was filed in Broome County Superior Courts Broome County Supreme Court with Jeffrey Tait presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2009 |
CategoryForeclosure |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroome County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseBroome County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time3099 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 20, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
|
July 30, 2014 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | |
June 20, 2014 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
June 20, 2014 | Docket Event | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | |
March 18, 2010 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: OTHER(SPECIFY IN DESCRIPTION AREA) (Motion #N/A) | |
March 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Proposed Exparte Order (Fee required - 45.00) (Motion #N/A) | |
January 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Dominick Saia aff of mailing |
|
January 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Dominick Saia aff |
|
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Kevin Twining aff |
|
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Jennifer Twining aff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.