Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chase Home Finance Llc, Successor By Merger To Chase Manhattan Mortgage Corporation, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Kumiega, Brian B, against Cory J. Beschorner, Ge Capital Consumer Card Co., John Doe, Manufacturers And Traders Trust Company, Shanay L. Beschorner, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Broome County. This case was filed in Broome County Superior Courts Broome County Supreme Court with Catherine C Schaewe presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 04, 2009 |
CategoryForeclosure |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationBroome County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseBroome County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time319 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #2009/003200) | |
August 26, 2010 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
March 02, 2010 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: OTHER(SPECIFY IN DESCRIPTION AREA) (Motion #2009/003200) | |
March 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Proposed Exparte Order (Fee required - 45.00) (Motion #2009/003200) | |
January 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Cory Beschorner aff of mailing |
|
January 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Shanay Beschorner aff of mailing |
|
January 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Shanay Beschorner aff |
|
January 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Cory Beschorner aff |
|
January 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE G.E. Cap. aff |
|
December 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Manuf. aff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.