Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Cliffside Park Imaging & Diagnostic Center A A O Haoua Ilboudo, filed a(n) No Fault case represented by Cohen, Stephen Mark, against Mvaic, represented by Marshall, Craig B, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2022 |
CategoryNo Fault |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
|
NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: September 16, 2022ANSWER
Date: August 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 19, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
November 28, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Affirmation in support of motion |
||
September 16, 2022 | NOTICE OF TRIAL | ||
August 29, 2022 |
ANSWER verified answer to complaint |
||
August 19, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 21, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.