Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Esperidion Zurita Garcia, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Diamond, Beth Michelle, against Euclid Glenmore Housing Development Fund Corporation, Euclid Glenmore Llc, Mega Contracting Group Llc, represented by Cirone, Thomas J, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts with Lucindo Suarez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 22, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Labor Law) |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 22, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 07, 2022ANSWER
Date: January 20, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: February 08, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 07, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 08, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 20, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: January 20, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2023 |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE dated 3-13-2023 |
||
February 08, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
February 08, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
January 20, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
January 20, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands |
||
January 20, 2023 | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
January 20, 2023 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION | ||
December 14, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 07, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 07, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.